THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:22:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records, please contact the Sunnybrook Health Records department for instructions: https://sunnybrook.ca/content/?page=care-stay-priv-hr
Date Received: 30 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Ann Badali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records, please contact the Sunnybrook Health Records department for instructions: https://sunnybrook.ca/content/?page=care-stay-priv-hr
Date Received: 30 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Ann Badali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981