THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Nova Southeastern University
Center for Collaborative Research
3321 College Ave Suite 405
Davie Florida 33314
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 945 262-2898
Fax: 945 262-3850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bested Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Nova Southeastern University
Center for Collaborative Research
3321 College Ave Suite 405
Davie Florida 33314
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 945 262-2898
Fax: 945 262-3850

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bested Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON CHRISTINE BESTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESTED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON CHRISTINE BESTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESTED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979