THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Smyth Paediatric Group
1929 Russell Road
Suite 220
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7707
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan Gravelle Professional Corporation Medicine
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Smyth Paediatric Group
1929 Russell Road
Suite 220
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7707
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan Gravelle Professional Corporation Medicine
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY RITA JOAN GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY RITA JOAN GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982