THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:37:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paulette E. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Burns (CPSO#: 50231 )
Business Address: 2 - 5 Armstrong Point Road
Port Carling Ontario P0B 1J0
(705) 765-5349
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paulette E. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Burns (CPSO#: 50231 )
Business Address: 2 - 5 Armstrong Point Road
Port Carling Ontario P0B 1J0
(705) 765-5349
Business Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULETTE ELIZABETH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULETTE ELIZABETH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982