THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 417 Scenic Dr
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053175868
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gibson, Clinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 417 Scenic Dr
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053175868
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gibson, Clinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MARIA CLINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLINTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MARIA CLINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLINTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981