THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:58:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Effective February 28, 2018:
Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 22 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Effective February 28, 2018:
Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 22 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Sep 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982