THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:54:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Phone# 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 08 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David S. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Phone# 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 08 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David S. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982