THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:00:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:

Paula
Dufferin Area Family Health Team
Telephone: (519) 938-8802 ext. 331
Fax: (888) 527-2813
Date Received: 29 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:

Paula
Dufferin Area Family Health Team
Telephone: (519) 938-8802 ext. 331
Fax: (888) 527-2813
Date Received: 29 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RODGER CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RODGER CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982