THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:58:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982