THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:05:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Southlake Hospital Health Records Department: Telephone 905-895-4521, extension 2315, Email: ROIHealthRecordssouthlake.ca
Date Received: 23 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDM Duic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Duic (CPSO#: 50470 )
Business Address: 2/634 West Level 2
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Southlake Hospital Health Records Department: Telephone 905-895-4521, extension 2315, Email: ROIHealthRecordssouthlake.ca
Date Received: 23 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDM Duic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Duic (CPSO#: 50470 )
Business Address: 2/634 West Level 2
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 06 Feb 2025
Summary of Decision:
On February 6, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Duic, in his care and treatment of Patient A, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, demonstrated a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment, and exposed Patient A to risk of harm and injury.
 
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Duic attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Duic’s certificate of registration for three (3) months commencing February 7, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Duic’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Duic pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 7, 2025.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Decision: 06 Feb 2025
Summary of Decision:
On February 6, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Duic, in his care and treatment of Patient A, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, demonstrated a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment, and exposed Patient A to risk of harm and injury.
 
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Duic attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Duic’s certificate of registration for three (3) months commencing February 7, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Duic’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Duic pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 7, 2025.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Apr 2025
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 07 Feb 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982