THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:22:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Tele: 613-548-2368
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. K. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Tele: 613-548-2368
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. K. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980