THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:53:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Apartment 6G
316 West 84th Street
New York New York 10024
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (646) 525-9945
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Apartment 6G
316 West 84th Street
New York New York 10024
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (646) 525-9945
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
22 Dec 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 22 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 22, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Douglas Uhrig in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Uhrig to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. James Douglas Uhrig
("Dr.Uhrig")

to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO

(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to theRegulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"CPD" means continuing profeSsional development;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Uhrig, certificate of registration number 50487, am a member of the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.

(3) I, Dr. Uhrig, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement undersection 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practice medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by that the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.

(6) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practice and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practice in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(7) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practice, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached here to as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(8) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(10) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee or Fit to Practice Committee of the College.

(12) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code."

(14) Public Register: I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Uhrig, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate inquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provision sof this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached here to as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 22, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Douglas Uhrig in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Uhrig to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. James Douglas Uhrig
("Dr.Uhrig")

to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO

(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to theRegulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"CPD" means continuing profeSsional development;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Uhrig, certificate of registration number 50487, am a member of the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.

(3) I, Dr. Uhrig, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement undersection 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practice medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by that the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.

(6) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practice and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practice in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(7) I, Dr. Uhrig, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practice, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached here to as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(8) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(10) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee or Fit to Practice Committee of the College.

(12) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code."

(14) Public Register: I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Uhrig, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate inquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provision sof this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Uhrig, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached here to as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979