THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:59:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Health Records Department
519-685-8500 ext. 52865
Date Received: 15 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Gurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Health Records Department
519-685-8500 ext. 52865
Date Received: 15 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Gurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1980