THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:37:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St.Regis Crescent S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 20 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl L. Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St.Regis Crescent S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 20 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl L. Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982