THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:43:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Nith Valley Family Practice
10 Waterloo St
New Hamburg, Ontario
N3A 1V5
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Erling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Nith Valley Family Practice
10 Waterloo St
New Hamburg, Ontario
N3A 1V5
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Erling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981