THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Mrs. Anjou Mehta, Health Information Custodian
Dundas 427 Medical Centre
4A-2200 Dundas Street East, Mississauga ON
Phone: (905) 232-0720; Fax: (905) 232-0790
Email: [email protected]; [email protected]
Date Received: 19 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Mrs. Anjou Mehta, Health Information Custodian
Dundas 427 Medical Centre
4A-2200 Dundas Street East, Mississauga ON
Phone: (905) 232-0720; Fax: (905) 232-0790
Email: [email protected]; [email protected]
Date Received: 19 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMULO ESGUERRA JAVIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROMULO ESGUERRA JAVIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980