THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4430 Bathurst Street
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 630-3174
Fax: 416-630-3070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E. Noakes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4430 Bathurst Street
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 630-3174
Fax: 416-630-3070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E. Noakes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ELLIOTT NOAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOAKES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ELLIOTT NOAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOAKES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977