THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Temple University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Richmond Hill Childrens Clinic
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Pediatric Diabetes Clinic
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7534
Fax: (905) 472-7535
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 228186
Fax: (416) 813-8770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Temple University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Richmond Hill Childrens Clinic
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Pediatric Diabetes Clinic
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7534
Fax: (905) 472-7535
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 228186
Fax: (416) 813-8770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELLEN KIRSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELLEN KIRSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Temple University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981