THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mazza-Whelan, Angela Marie (Used Until: 27 Apr 2017)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 205 - 849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L8J 2P4
Date Received: 16 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Mazza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: Mazza-Whelan, Angela Marie (Used Until: 27 Apr 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 205 - 849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L8J 2P4
Date Received: 16 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Mazza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981