THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank J. Mace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank J. Mace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
02 Oct 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 2, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frank Jan Mace in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mace to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Mace has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
jurisdictions.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 2, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frank Jan Mace in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mace to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Mace has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
jurisdictions.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982