THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Jul 2000
Summary of Decision:
On July 28, 2000, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. McHugh s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct re: sexual abuse of a patient and ordered the following penalty:

1) revocation of certificate of registration
2) reprimand to be recorded on the register
3) that Dr. McHugh reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient under the program required under section 85.7.

On August 16, 2005, the Discipline Committee made the decision to direct the Registrar to reinstate Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration subject to the following terms, conditions and limitations:

1. Dr. McHugh will limit his practice to clinical settings that are either team-based or, in which other physicians also practice. In non-team based setting, there shall be either a physician or an administrative staff person in the same office setting while Dr. McHugh sees patients;

2. Dr. McHugh will cause workplace monitor(s) acceptable to the College, in each setting in which he practices, to execute an undertaking (in the form attached as Schedule A to the order), prior to commencing work in any such setting;

3. At least once per month, Dr. McHugh shall see a psychiatrist who is acceptable to the College, for treatment as required. Dr. McHugh shall comply with all treatment recommendations of his psychiatrist;

4. Dr. McHugh shall cause his treating psychiatrist to execute an undertaking, (in the form attached as Schedule B to the order), within thirty (30) days of the date of this order;

5. If a person who has given an undertaking in the form of a Schedule to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. McHugh shall, within 30 days, obtain an undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College;

6. If any of the reports of the workplace monitor(s) or psychiatrist are not delivered or are unsatisfactory to the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration;

7. Dr. McHugh shall undergo and successfully complete to the satisfaction of the College an assessment under the direction of the College in each of his practice settings within twelve (12) months of his return to practice. The assessment will be at Dr. McHugh s expense and may include, among other things, an observation component, consultation with his workplace monitor(s) and his treating psychiatrist, and a chart review. Dr. McHugh shall comply with any recommendations of the College that result from the assessment;

8. In the event that Dr. McHugh is unsuccessful in the completion of the assessment or in complying with any recommendations that result from the assessment as determined by the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration until he successfully completes the assessment or complies with the recommendations;

9. Dr. McHugh shall pay to the College $2,750.00 to satisfy an outstanding costs order. Such amount shall be paid within six months of the date of this order; and;

10. Dr. McHugh shall not apply to vary any of the terms of this order until at least two (2) years have passed from the date of this order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 28, 2000
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 16 Aug 2005
    Decision: Application Accepted

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Jul 2000
Summary of Decision:
On July 28, 2000, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. McHugh s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct re: sexual abuse of a patient and ordered the following penalty:

1) revocation of certificate of registration
2) reprimand to be recorded on the register
3) that Dr. McHugh reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient under the program required under section 85.7.

On August 16, 2005, the Discipline Committee made the decision to direct the Registrar to reinstate Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration subject to the following terms, conditions and limitations:

1. Dr. McHugh will limit his practice to clinical settings that are either team-based or, in which other physicians also practice. In non-team based setting, there shall be either a physician or an administrative staff person in the same office setting while Dr. McHugh sees patients;

2. Dr. McHugh will cause workplace monitor(s) acceptable to the College, in each setting in which he practices, to execute an undertaking (in the form attached as Schedule A to the order), prior to commencing work in any such setting;

3. At least once per month, Dr. McHugh shall see a psychiatrist who is acceptable to the College, for treatment as required. Dr. McHugh shall comply with all treatment recommendations of his psychiatrist;

4. Dr. McHugh shall cause his treating psychiatrist to execute an undertaking, (in the form attached as Schedule B to the order), within thirty (30) days of the date of this order;

5. If a person who has given an undertaking in the form of a Schedule to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. McHugh shall, within 30 days, obtain an undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College;

6. If any of the reports of the workplace monitor(s) or psychiatrist are not delivered or are unsatisfactory to the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration;

7. Dr. McHugh shall undergo and successfully complete to the satisfaction of the College an assessment under the direction of the College in each of his practice settings within twelve (12) months of his return to practice. The assessment will be at Dr. McHugh s expense and may include, among other things, an observation component, consultation with his workplace monitor(s) and his treating psychiatrist, and a chart review. Dr. McHugh shall comply with any recommendations of the College that result from the assessment;

8. In the event that Dr. McHugh is unsuccessful in the completion of the assessment or in complying with any recommendations that result from the assessment as determined by the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration until he successfully completes the assessment or complies with the recommendations;

9. Dr. McHugh shall pay to the College $2,750.00 to satisfy an outstanding costs order. Such amount shall be paid within six months of the date of this order; and;

10. Dr. McHugh shall not apply to vary any of the terms of this order until at least two (2) years have passed from the date of this order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 28, 2000
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 16 Aug 2005
    Decision: Application Accepted

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975