THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:15:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163686787
Fax: 4163687632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163686787
Fax: 4163687632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. R. ALAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. R. ALAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981