THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:06:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 3324 Station Main
Sarnia ON N7T 8G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-332-1117
Fax: 519-332-1119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: La Forte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 3324 Station Main
Sarnia ON N7T 8G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-332-1117
Fax: 519-332-1119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: La Forte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY LAFORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFORTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY LAFORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFORTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981