THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979