THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stoney Creek Family Medical Centre
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill McKeough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. McKeough (CPSO#: 57243 ) Dr. W. McKeough (CPSO#: 51168 )
Business Address: Stoney Creek Family Medical Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
Unit 1
London Ontario N5X 0H7
(519) 679-1717

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stoney Creek Family Medical Centre
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill McKeough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. McKeough (CPSO#: 57243 ) Dr. W. McKeough (CPSO#: 51168 )
Business Address: Stoney Creek Family Medical Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
Unit 1
London Ontario N5X 0H7
(519) 679-1717

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PAUL MCKEOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEOUGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PAUL MCKEOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEOUGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982