THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:03:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Mroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Mroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Effective Date: 30 Nov 2013
Summary:
Dr. Mroz has resigned from the practice of medicine, effective November 30, 2013.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Effective Date: 30 Nov 2013
Summary:
Dr. Mroz has resigned from the practice of medicine, effective November 30, 2013.

Training

Medical School: Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979