THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Cheuk Derek Ng
2320 Brimley Road
Scarborough, Ontario
M1S 3L6
Date Received: 31 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sai-Sun Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Cheuk Derek Ng
2320 Brimley Road
Scarborough, Ontario
M1S 3L6
Date Received: 31 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sai-Sun Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982