THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:46:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Dr. Harkiran Mallhi
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
519 570 1200
Date Received: 10 Jun 2021

Instructions/Address: Contact Dr. Mallhi
1187 Fischer Hallman Road, Kitchener, ON N2E 4H9
Date Received: 21 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ray Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Dr. Harkiran Mallhi
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
519 570 1200
Date Received: 10 Jun 2021

Instructions/Address: Contact Dr. Mallhi
1187 Fischer Hallman Road, Kitchener, ON N2E 4H9
Date Received: 21 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ray Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981