THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lausanne, 1971
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE
Medical School: University of Lausanne, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lausanne, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Apr 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978