THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:35:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 209A - 157 Queen St E
Brampton, ON L6W 3X4
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MA Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 209A - 157 Queen St E
Brampton, ON L6W 3X4
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MA Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Feb 2004
Summary of Decision:
On February 11, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Pinto have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice for being found guilty of defrauding the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board of more than $5,000.

The Discipline Committee directs:

1) Dr. Pinto to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2) Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months commencing February 11, 2004, six months of which shall be suspended if Dr. Pinto,
(a) makes restitution to the Workplace Safety Insurance Board in the amount of $200,000.00, by making monthly payments to the WSIB in the amount of $5,000, immediately upon returning to practice, provided the amount of any such monthly payment does not exceed 20% of Dr. Pinto=s gross billing for that month, in which case Dr. Pinto will pay to the WSIB 20% of his gross billing for that month; and
(b) within six months of the date of this Order, successfully completes, at his own expense, the College s ethics course.

3) That in the event that Dr. Pinto fails to comply with the requirements under paragraph 3(a) and (b) above, the suspension of Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration shall resume and continue for the remaining six (6) months.

4) That the following terms and conditions be placed on Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration:
(a) that for a period of two (2) years from his return to practise, Dr. Pinto co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College who shall conduct three inspections of Dr. Pinto s OHIP billings and their supporting chart entries for specified codes and periods subsequent to the date of this Order of the inspector s choosing. These inspections shall be conducted approximately six, twelve and twenty four months after his return to practise;
(b) that the costs of the inspections referred to in paragraph (a) herein be borne by Dr. Pinto; and.
(c) that Dr. Pinto hire and retain an arm s-length employee who shall perform all secretarial and billing functions for Dr. Pinto s practice.

5) Dr. Pinto pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500 within twelve (12) months of the date of this Order.

6) That the results of this proceeding be included in the Register.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2004

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Nov 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Feb 2004
Summary of Decision:
On February 11, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Pinto have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice for being found guilty of defrauding the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board of more than $5,000.

The Discipline Committee directs:

1) Dr. Pinto to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2) Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months commencing February 11, 2004, six months of which shall be suspended if Dr. Pinto,
(a) makes restitution to the Workplace Safety Insurance Board in the amount of $200,000.00, by making monthly payments to the WSIB in the amount of $5,000, immediately upon returning to practice, provided the amount of any such monthly payment does not exceed 20% of Dr. Pinto=s gross billing for that month, in which case Dr. Pinto will pay to the WSIB 20% of his gross billing for that month; and
(b) within six months of the date of this Order, successfully completes, at his own expense, the College s ethics course.

3) That in the event that Dr. Pinto fails to comply with the requirements under paragraph 3(a) and (b) above, the suspension of Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration shall resume and continue for the remaining six (6) months.

4) That the following terms and conditions be placed on Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration:
(a) that for a period of two (2) years from his return to practise, Dr. Pinto co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College who shall conduct three inspections of Dr. Pinto s OHIP billings and their supporting chart entries for specified codes and periods subsequent to the date of this Order of the inspector s choosing. These inspections shall be conducted approximately six, twelve and twenty four months after his return to practise;
(b) that the costs of the inspections referred to in paragraph (a) herein be borne by Dr. Pinto; and.
(c) that Dr. Pinto hire and retain an arm s-length employee who shall perform all secretarial and billing functions for Dr. Pinto s practice.

5) Dr. Pinto pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500 within twelve (12) months of the date of this Order.

6) That the results of this proceeding be included in the Register.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2004

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Nov 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 11 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981