THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:16:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 22 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carrol Pitters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 22 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carrol Pitters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980