THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fairview Medical Arts Centre
Suite 109
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-6788
Fax: (905) 333-9775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fairview Medical Arts Centre
Suite 109
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-6788
Fax: (905) 333-9775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER PYPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER PYPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982