THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 907-7167
Fax: (905) 771-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may submit a request to Dr. Nauth-Misir at 531 Atkinson Avenue, Thornhill, Ontario, L4J 6Y6, Telephone: 905-907-7167
Date Received: 16 Jan 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 907-7167
Fax: (905) 771-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may submit a request to Dr. Nauth-Misir at 531 Atkinson Avenue, Thornhill, Ontario, L4J 6Y6, Telephone: 905-907-7167
Date Received: 16 Jan 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN RAPOPORT-GLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPOPORT-GLICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN RAPOPORT-GLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPOPORT-GLICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981