THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 05:38:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Apr 1995
Summary of Decision:
In a decision which was released in July 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ravikovich guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he made a misrepresentation respecting a remedy, treatment or device, contrary to s. 27(24). The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Ravikovich was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to have a restriction placed upon it for an indefinite period, prohibiting him from employing histamine for purposes of diagnosis or therapy in the practice of medicine, except for the utilization of histamine as a positive control in standard allergy skin testing. This prohibition was also not to apply to the employment by Dr. Ravikovich of standard allergen extracts in accordance with the accepted standard of practice of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Apart from the two exceptions cited above, Dr. Ravikovich was not to employ for diagnostic or therapeutic purposes any biological material which contained histamine.

3. Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to be suspended for a period of three months, the suspension to be itself suspended provided that the Doctor submitted his practice to inspection by an inspector appointed by the Registrar, including production of the records of his practice, within six months of this Order becoming final.

Dr. Ravikovish(s appeal of the decision was dismissed.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-11-17
Hearing Date(s): Feb 07, 1994

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2010
Summary:
Undertaking, effective November 1, 2010, by Dr. Felix Ravikovich to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Felix Ravikovich, as a result of investigations and disciplinary proceedings regarding my care and conduct, have agreed to cease to practice medicine in all jurisdictions and not to re-apply for a certificate of registration.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Apr 1995
Summary of Decision:
In a decision which was released in July 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ravikovich guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he made a misrepresentation respecting a remedy, treatment or device, contrary to s. 27(24). The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Ravikovich was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to have a restriction placed upon it for an indefinite period, prohibiting him from employing histamine for purposes of diagnosis or therapy in the practice of medicine, except for the utilization of histamine as a positive control in standard allergy skin testing. This prohibition was also not to apply to the employment by Dr. Ravikovich of standard allergen extracts in accordance with the accepted standard of practice of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Apart from the two exceptions cited above, Dr. Ravikovich was not to employ for diagnostic or therapeutic purposes any biological material which contained histamine.

3. Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to be suspended for a period of three months, the suspension to be itself suspended provided that the Doctor submitted his practice to inspection by an inspector appointed by the Registrar, including production of the records of his practice, within six months of this Order becoming final.

Dr. Ravikovish(s appeal of the decision was dismissed.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-11-17
Hearing Date(s): Feb 07, 1994

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 01 Nov 2010
Summary:
Undertaking, effective November 1, 2010, by Dr. Felix Ravikovich to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Felix Ravikovich, as a result of investigations and disciplinary proceedings regarding my care and conduct, have agreed to cease to practice medicine in all jurisdictions and not to re-apply for a certificate of registration.

Training

Medical School: First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982