THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 01:09:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-5612
Fax: (705) 759-7460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Rossi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rossi (CPSO#: 51523 )
Business Address: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
(705) 759-1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-5612
Fax: (705) 759-7460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Rossi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rossi (CPSO#: 51523 )
Business Address: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
(705) 759-1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE ROSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE ROSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982