THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 09 Dec 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Date Received: 22 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 09 Dec 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Date Received: 22 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981