THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:39:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
14-McL
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166036205
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
14-McL
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166036205
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH WITHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH WITHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1981