THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:00:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 4031
St. Catharines Main
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 730-5647
Fax: (905) 225-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl Stobbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 4031
St. Catharines Main
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 730-5647
Fax: (905) 225-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl Stobbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL EDWARD STOBBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL EDWARD STOBBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982