THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:00:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health & Community Services
540 Finch Ave. W
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 436-0385
Fax: (416) 645-0215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health & Community Services
540 Finch Ave. W
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 436-0385
Fax: (416) 645-0215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA STERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA STERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980