THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980