THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Sep 2013
Summary of Decision:
On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Sliwin had a sexual relationship with his patient, Ms A, during the currency of a doctor- patient relationship. This sexual relationship, which included sexual intercourse, constitutes sexual abuse of a patient under section 51(1)(b.1) of the Code.

Dr. Sliwin failed to maintain proper boundaries with Ms A over the long period he was her physician. The Committee found this to be disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Following a contested penalty hearing that took place on June 13, 2014, on April 1, 2015, the Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar revoke Dr. Sliwin’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
2. Dr. Sliwin appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

At the penalty hearing, the Committee heard a constitutional motion brought by Dr. Sliwin.

The Discipline Committee rejected Dr. Sliwin’s constitutional argument that the mandatory revocation provisions of the Health Professions Procedural Code were not intended to apply to “pre-existing relationships” and noted that in any event Dr. Sliwin had been Patient A’s physician even before the start of their sexual relationship. The Committee accepted that mandatory revocation as set out in the Code is an appropriate means to deal with the very real problem of sexual abuse of patients by physicians and to ensure protection of the public from such abuse. The Committee held that the mandatory revocation provisions do not violate either section 7 (which provides that everyone has the right to life, liberty, and security of the person and the right not to be deprived thereof, except in accordance with the principles of fundamental justice) or section 15 (the equality provisions) of the Charter of Rights and Freedoms. As a result, the Committee found that the mandatory revocation provisions were constitutional and indeed applicable to Dr. Sliwin.

On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).

On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin made a motion to the Divisional Court to stay the order of the Discipline Committee pending the appeal.

On April 8, 2015, the Divisional Court ordered that Dr. Sliwin’s revocation be stayed and that he be permitted to practise pending the appeal.

On February 1, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered that:
- Dr. Sliwin pay costs to the College in the amount of $48,140.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
- Dr. Sliwin is required to reimburse the College for funding that may be provided to the complainant under the College’s program that provides funding for therapy or counselling for persons who, while patients, were sexually abused by members; and to post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00, to guarantee the payment of any amounts he may be required to reimburse for funding provided to the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code.

On March 27, 2017, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Sliwin’s appeal, except that the Court vacated the Committee’s order of February 1, 2016 to provide security for therapy or counseling costs. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee, except for the order to provide security for therapy or counseling costs, is in effect.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2017-03-27
Hearing Date(s): June 6-8,June 18-22, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Sep 2013
Summary of Decision:
On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Sliwin had a sexual relationship with his patient, Ms A, during the currency of a doctor- patient relationship. This sexual relationship, which included sexual intercourse, constitutes sexual abuse of a patient under section 51(1)(b.1) of the Code.

Dr. Sliwin failed to maintain proper boundaries with Ms A over the long period he was her physician. The Committee found this to be disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Following a contested penalty hearing that took place on June 13, 2014, on April 1, 2015, the Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar revoke Dr. Sliwin’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
2. Dr. Sliwin appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

At the penalty hearing, the Committee heard a constitutional motion brought by Dr. Sliwin.

The Discipline Committee rejected Dr. Sliwin’s constitutional argument that the mandatory revocation provisions of the Health Professions Procedural Code were not intended to apply to “pre-existing relationships” and noted that in any event Dr. Sliwin had been Patient A’s physician even before the start of their sexual relationship. The Committee accepted that mandatory revocation as set out in the Code is an appropriate means to deal with the very real problem of sexual abuse of patients by physicians and to ensure protection of the public from such abuse. The Committee held that the mandatory revocation provisions do not violate either section 7 (which provides that everyone has the right to life, liberty, and security of the person and the right not to be deprived thereof, except in accordance with the principles of fundamental justice) or section 15 (the equality provisions) of the Charter of Rights and Freedoms. As a result, the Committee found that the mandatory revocation provisions were constitutional and indeed applicable to Dr. Sliwin.

On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).

On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin made a motion to the Divisional Court to stay the order of the Discipline Committee pending the appeal.

On April 8, 2015, the Divisional Court ordered that Dr. Sliwin’s revocation be stayed and that he be permitted to practise pending the appeal.

On February 1, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered that:
- Dr. Sliwin pay costs to the College in the amount of $48,140.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
- Dr. Sliwin is required to reimburse the College for funding that may be provided to the complainant under the College’s program that provides funding for therapy or counselling for persons who, while patients, were sexually abused by members; and to post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00, to guarantee the payment of any amounts he may be required to reimburse for funding provided to the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code.

On March 27, 2017, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Sliwin’s appeal, except that the Court vacated the Committee’s order of February 1, 2016 to provide security for therapy or counseling costs. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee, except for the order to provide security for therapy or counseling costs, is in effect.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2017-03-27
Hearing Date(s): June 6-8,June 18-22, 2012

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980