THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:58:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Milton Centre for Women's Health
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton, ON L9T 3Z9
Date Received: 13 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 26 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Milton Centre for Women's Health
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton, ON L9T 3Z9
Date Received: 13 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Mar 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2018


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980