THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 02:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 30 BEDALE DRIVE NEPEAN FOR RECORDS PRIOR TO 2016.
FROM 2016 TO 2021 ALL RECORDS ARE AT THE RICHMOND MEDICAL CENTRE, 6265-2 PERTH STREET RICHMOND, ONTARIO K0A2Z0
Date Received: 20 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.P. Riddick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 30 BEDALE DRIVE NEPEAN FOR RECORDS PRIOR TO 2016.
FROM 2016 TO 2021 ALL RECORDS ARE AT THE RICHMOND MEDICAL CENTRE, 6265-2 PERTH STREET RICHMOND, ONTARIO K0A2Z0
Date Received: 20 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.P. Riddick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1982