THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Western New York Medical Park
550 Orchard Park Road
Suite A105
West Seneca New York 14224
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (718) 677-6000
Fax: (716) 677-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 05 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Western New York Medical Park
550 Orchard Park Road
Suite A105
West Seneca New York 14224
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (718) 677-6000
Fax: (716) 677-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 05 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982