THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1225 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M6H 2H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 531-5425
Fax: (416) 531-6728
Address: Suite 355,1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E,
Mississauga Ontario L4X2Z9
Phone: 416 279 1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Eye Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5892
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 117
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 481-9995
Fax: (416) 531-6728

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1225 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M6H 2H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 531-5425
Fax: (416) 531-6728
Address: Suite 355,1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E,
Mississauga Ontario L4X2Z9
Phone: 416 279 1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Eye Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5892
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 117
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 481-9995
Fax: (416) 531-6728

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL NAHMAN MARKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL NAHMAN MARKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1979