THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 222 Hamilton St
Toronto, Ontario
M4M 2E2
Date Received: 24 Aug 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 222 Hamilton St
Toronto, Ontario
M4M 2E2
Date Received: 24 Aug 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982