THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:45:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 633-7201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick M. Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liao (CPSO#: 51999 )
Business Address: King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 302
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 566-0905

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 633-7201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick M. Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liao (CPSO#: 51999 )
Business Address: King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 302
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
(905) 566-0905

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK MANZANO LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK MANZANO LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981