THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:18:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Southwestern University, 1972
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 08 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: Southwestern University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 08 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Southwestern University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981