THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:15:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Ghana, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should submit medical record requests to the location where Dr. Ulzen treated them:

Algoma Family Services
205 McNabb Street
Sault-Ste-Marie ON P6B 1Y3
Phone: 705-945-5050

York Medical Centre - Newmarket
17730 Leslie Street
Unit 101
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 905-853-0404

Patients who saw Dr. Ulzen at a location not listed above should email medical record requests to [email protected].
Date Received: 24 Apr 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Alabama
USA - North Carolina
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN
Medical School: Univ of Ghana, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should submit medical record requests to the location where Dr. Ulzen treated them:

Algoma Family Services
205 McNabb Street
Sault-Ste-Marie ON P6B 1Y3
Phone: 705-945-5050

York Medical Centre - Newmarket
17730 Leslie Street
Unit 101
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 905-853-0404

Patients who saw Dr. Ulzen at a location not listed above should email medical record requests to [email protected].
Date Received: 24 Apr 2025

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Alabama
USA - North Carolina
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THADDEUS PATRICK MANUS ULZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULZEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THADDEUS PATRICK MANUS ULZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULZEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Ghana, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1980