THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Scarborough Hospital General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough, ON M1P 2V5
Date Received: 28 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Scarborough Hospital General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough, ON M1P 2V5
Date Received: 28 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1979